Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH ST MARY THE VIRGIN, ISLEWORTH

Charity number: 1168356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID SAMUEL MACLURE Chair 17 October 2017
None on record
Sharleen Tsuchihashi Trustee 24 April 2022
THE BLUE SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Adelika Andrew Kanyonyi Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Lai Yin Sing Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Jennifer Clare Jefferies Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
Stuart James Main Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
Veronica Kathleen Watson Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
Margaret Gwendoline Lawrence Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Ruth White Trustee 13 July 2020
None on record
Akinyemi Olaiya Owolabi Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Rev Oliver Andrew Douglas-Pennant Trustee 25 March 2019
None on record
Mary Guinevere Manthey-Steel Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Michael Gruffudd Jefferies Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Anna Rose Marshall Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
BRIAN DUDLEY FRANCIS GRUMBRIDGE Trustee 26 April 2015
THE ISLEWORTH SOCIETY
Received: On time
GAYLE COURTLYN FARRELL Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
HANNAH BOULTON Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record