THE WELCOME DIRECTORY

Charity number: 1169014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amrik Singh Trustee 08 November 2017 None on record
Rev Robert Wilson Trustee 05 July 2016
PRISONS WEEK Received: On time
Rizwana Reza Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
ERIC SOUTHWICK Trustee 05 July 2016
TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH STANLEY STREET INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH, SEAHAM Received: On time
HELP, EDUCATION AND RESOURCES TO BRING EVERYONE ALL TOGETHER Received: On time
THE FREE CHURCH FEDERAL COUNCIL (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
Peter Holloway Trustee 05 April 2017 None on record
Shaffiq Din Trustee 11 September 2018 None on record
David Spademan Trustee 05 July 2016
ASSEMBLY OF GOD CHURCH Received: On time