DANBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1168979
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 10 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 06 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 21 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 22 November 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)