DANBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1168979
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KENNETH STUART AXON Trustee 11 May 2015 None on record
MARGARET AXON Chair 11 May 2015
EVES CORNER WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Charity reporting is up to date
CAROLYN ANN CARTER Trustee 13 March 2017
EVES CORNER WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Charity reporting is up to date
THE BEDE GRIFFITHS CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
DEBORAH JANE HAY Trustee 13 May 2019
DANBURY PATIENT INVOLVEMENT GROUP Charity reporting is 31 days late
BARBARA ROSE FRENCH Trustee 28 May 2015 None on record
JULIE ANNE BARKER Trustee 11 May 2015 None on record
Rev JACQUELINE DORIAN JONES Trustee 05 November 2018 None on record
THERESA ELIZABETH ANN BYLES Trustee 05 March 2018
FRIENDS OF THE MOOT HALL CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
IRIS EVELYN HILL Trustee 11 July 2016 None on record
Elisabeth Sinclair Trustee 01 July 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DANBURY ST JOHN BAPTIST Charity reporting is up to date
CHARITY FOR REPAIR OF CHURCH Charity reporting is up to date
CATHERINE ALICE ABLOTT Trustee 05 November 2018 None on record
ALMA WHITCUTT Trustee 11 May 2015 None on record
EAMONN MICHAEL HALL Trustee 11 July 2016 None on record
ALEXANDER IAN COOPER Trustee 11 July 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DANBURY ST JOHN BAPTIST Charity reporting is up to date
CHARITY FOR REPAIR OF CHURCH Charity reporting is up to date
HELEN ELIZABETH MCIVER Trustee 11 May 2015 None on record
MURRAY JEREL NIMAN Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record