Accounts and annual returns THE CARRBRIDGE CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1169326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 July 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 July 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 05 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window