Financial history THE CARRBRIDGE CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1169326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £53.69k £87.05k £193.95k £223.95k £225.96k
Total expenditure £71.67k £100.42k £136.71k £203.95k £225.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £77.98k N/A