SUNNAH SPORTS ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1172620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nalette Janine Tucker Chair 03 November 2019 None on record
Amina Hajee Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Dr Rafaqut Rashid Trustee 08 June 2020 None on record
Halima Hajee Trustee 31 January 2018 None on record
Naheed Rehman Trustee 13 June 2020
THE AL MAGHRIB FOUNDATION Received: On time