Accounts and annual returns INSPIRING YOUTH ACHIEVEMENT

Charity number: 1170347
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 26 February 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 26 February 2022 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 14 April 2020 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 14 April 2020 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 14 May 2019 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 14 May 2019 102 days late Download Open in new window