Financial history SYCAMORE HALLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1169184
Charity reporting is overdue by 509 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £28.12k £37.15k £84.58k £84.58k
Total expenditure £0 £24.22k £39.59k £71.16k £71.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £11.51k £1.90k £35.00k £19.50k