Financial history MAKE A DIFFERENCE SCHOOLS - MOMBASA

Charity number: 1170814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £12.99k £16.59k £18.48k £78.78k £38.91k
Total expenditure £7.18k £4.80k £7.94k £106.15k £5.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A