GREENWAY ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1170205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required