Accounts and annual returns ELYSIAN RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity number: 1170284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window