COTTON TEXTILES RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 509075
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £75.27k £84.23k £78.19k £86.64k £91.37k
Total expenditure £72.10k £22.00k £174.30k £2.57k £13.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A