Trustees SAINT BARBARA'S GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (SOUTHEND ON SEA DISTRICT)
Charity number: 1172177

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PANAGIOTIS SKORDAS | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAY SMART | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA KAMBUROVA | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PHOTAKOS | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Archbishop Nikitas Lioulias | Trustee | 04 December 2019 | ||||||
Panayiotis Toumbas | Trustee | 08 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUIS SAVVA | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREAS ANASTASIOU BA, PGCE | Trustee | 01 February 2003 |
|
|
||||
ANGELIKI CHARALAMBOUS | Trustee | 01 February 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.