Trustees Boroughbridge Community Charity
Charity number: 1171451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jules Preston | Chair | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jeyes | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Fox | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Dawn Maltby | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Hustwit | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nic Holmes | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Les Morrell | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE WALKER | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH VOSE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.