Accounts and annual returns ZAYNAB SALMASI CARDIOVASCULAR INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1170885
Charity reporting is overdue by 146 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required