Trustees ART MONTHLY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILL HEDLEY Trustee 29 June 2017
NORTHERN CANON
Received: On time
ISAAC JULIEN CBE Trustee 04 July 2016
None on record
TERESA SHEILA ROSE GLEADOWE Trustee 28 April 2016
None on record
PETER WILLIAM HENRY LYDIATE Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
Dr ANDREW GEORGE WILSON Trustee 29 February 2016
None on record