Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WEST GATE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509175
Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 128 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 128 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 March 2022 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 08 January 2021 314 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 24 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required