Accounts and annual returns THE SARDAR SOHAN SINGH CHHOKAR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 894 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2021 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1259 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window