Financial history THE SARDAR SOHAN SINGH CHHOKAR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A