WHITLEY BAY BIG LOCAL

Charity number: 1171848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 December 2018 On time Download