Trustees WHITLEY BAY BIG LOCAL
Charity number: 1171848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Buxton | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Haggie | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Frazer | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hetherington | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Crowe | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Frankenberg | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.