Accounts and annual returns FIRST GOOLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509454
Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 189 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 189 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 June 2021 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 March 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required