Financial history FIRST GOOLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509454
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.52k £8.59k £8.36k £9.63k £14.25k
Total expenditure £8.64k £5.92k £6.51k £11.18k £13.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A