Financial history FASHION REVOLUTION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £17.20k £5.74k £13.42k £29.73k £20.14k
Total expenditure £11.51k £9.87k £540 £5.11k £7.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A