Financial history MALVERN WELCOMES

Charity number: 1174004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £17.67k £36.00k £17.81k £14.54k £32.18k
Total expenditure £3.89k £24.76k £21.52k £4.67k £23.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.13k N/A N/A N/A