Accounts and annual returns MALVERN WELCOMES

Charity number: 1174004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On time
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 12 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 01 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 August 2019 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 August 2019 90 days late Download Open in new window