Accounts and annual returns SHOTS IN THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 15 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 January 2020 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 21 January 2020 266 days late Download Open in new window