LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS

Charity number: 509833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £27.88k £65.57k £34.63k £35.08k £24.01k
Total expenditure £30.75k £75.34k £32.24k £38.02k £19.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A