LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS

Charity number: 509833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Lindsell Trustee 18 November 2017 None on record
Nicholas Waller Chair 18 November 2018 None on record
John Ashley Crawford Trustee 12 November 2019
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS Recently registered
MEN'S SHED LICHFIELD Recently registered
Mike Tighe Trustee 18 November 2015
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS Recently registered
Sue Williams Trustee 08 November 2016 None on record
Robina Zoe Bettson Trustee 20 January 2021
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS Recently registered
LICHFIELD FESTIVAL OF MUSIC ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Minna Andrews Trustee 12 November 2019 None on record
Dr Paul Ecclestone-Brown Trustee 18 November 2017
APOLLO Recently registered
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS Recently registered
JOHN WHATMOUGH SKURR Trustee 18 November 2014
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS Recently registered
Charlotte Groves Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Stephen John Bushill Trustee 01 September 2021
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS Recently registered
ERIC JOHN LUNT Trustee 27 May 2011
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL SCHOOL Received: On time
LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL CHORUS Recently registered