Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL BENEFICE OF THE ASCENSION, CAMBRIDGE (ST. GILES WITH ST. PETER, ST. LUKE AND ST. AUGUSTINE)

Charity number: 1172822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £250.88k £246.01k £316.11k £262.29k £305.05k
Total expenditure £227.90k £208.87k £212.65k £281.44k £318.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.22k £4.46k N/A N/A N/A