Financial history KEELE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1173328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £4.62m £5.11m £4.07m £2.93m £6.44m
Total expenditure £4.75m £4.54m £4.42m £3.00m £6.53m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £538.46k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £290.80k £8.03k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.70m £2.35m £2.11m £2.34m £2.00m
Income - Other trading activities £879.38k £794.83k £596.38k £101.85k £3.99m
Income - Charitable activities £2.02m £1.93m £1.35m £488.23k £444.43k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.18k £898 £1.79k £464 £233
Income - Other £19.80k £39.20k £10.23k £6.40k £3.61k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.65m £3.56m £3.65m £2.42m £2.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.04m £983.78k £775.28k £572.54k £4.31m
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £6.00k £6.00k £6.00k £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £51.87k £0 £0 £0 £0