Accounts and annual returns 'LEARN TO LOVE TO READ'

Charity number: 1175288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window