Accounts and annual returns BRADLEY STOKE EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1176613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window