Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS' STOPSLEY
Charity number: 1175152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Graham Alexander | Chair | 31 March 1995 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Shiela Stipta | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NEWBOUND | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH YOUNGER | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ANN BACHINI | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ANNE CLITHEROE | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN GARY DOLBY | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Neil Rolls | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.