Trustees ARLINGHAM VICTORY HALL
Charity number: 1173603

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Tucker | Chair | 25 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Pullin | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marc Freebrey | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Gardiner | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Dawn Rew | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hugh Bliss | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Pritchard | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JEWELL | Trustee | 20 June 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.