Trustees THE CHELLASTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID CARTWRIGHT Chair 01 October 2013
None on record
Andrew HILL Trustee 02 October 2021
None on record
Christopher Maurice FISHER Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record
RAYMOND ALFRED WATTS Trustee 06 November 2017
None on record
Hugh Morton Frank Craig Trustee 14 October 2017
None on record
Joyce Chadwick Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
ANNE HAYWOOD Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
PAUL HICKLIN Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
IAN COLDER Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record