Financial history ELIZABETH MONTAGU CORRESPONDENCE ONLINE

Charity number: 1174697
Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023
Total gross income £131.00k £35.06k £41.00k £42.31k £10.01k
Total expenditure £76.99k £78.74k £43.54k £37.31k £23.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A