Accounts and annual returns 14TH HOVE (ST ANDREWS PORTSLADE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1172771
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required