THE WRENBURY RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 510141
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £3.51k £701 £2.90k £7.43k £16.30k
Total expenditure £5.45k £12.97k £4.62k £9.64k £16.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A