DOST CENTRE FOR YOUNG REFUGEES AND MIGRANTS

Charity number: 1173622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 May 2019 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 May 2019 95 days late Download