YORK CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1176094
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Newhouse Trustee 05 September 2020 None on record
Edward Thomas Webb Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
Dee Boyle Trustee 05 September 2020 None on record
Ahmed Khaleel Trustee 29 January 2018 None on record
Dr Rasha Salaheldin Trustee 29 January 2018 None on record
Evie Kyte Trustee 22 February 2021 None on record
Rev PAUL WORDSWORTH Trustee 11 October 2017
HOLY ROOD COMMUNITY CHARITY Received: On time