Financial history RIPLEY OLD AGE PENSIONERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.86k £7.98k £8.26k £1.93k £4.44k
Total expenditure £11.22k £8.07k £8.86k £2.77k £2.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A