Financial history RIBCHESTER MUSEUM OF ROMAN ANTIQUITIES

Charity number: 510490
Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £38.73k £48.00k £44.69k £46.88k £42.15k
Total expenditure £49.95k £46.53k £50.14k £48.99k £38.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A