Linked charities SWANSEA SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MARCH 1967 AS AMENDED 10 JANUARY 1973, 7 SEPTEMBER 1976, 16 JANUARY 1992 AND 25 JULY 2007. AS AMENDED ON 03 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
1)TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN SWANSEA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS; AND 2) TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SWANSEA AND SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 08 June 1967 : Standard registration