Accounts and annual returns CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH ARTS

Charity number: 1178080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 08 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window