Accounts and annual returns MARRITT AND OMBLER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 510540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 26 March 2022 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 06 April 2021 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 06 April 2021 493 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 03 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required