Financial history MARRITT AND OMBLER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 510540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £1.48k £1.50k £1.54k £1.55k £800
Total expenditure £0 £2.16k £2.20k £1.40k £1.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A