INN CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1174347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 06 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download