Accounts and annual returns NUNEATON LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 510688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 June 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 23 June 2021 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required